PA HB1058 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act requiring that information on the option of perinatal support care programs be given to a woman after diagnosis of a life limiting condition; and imposing penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring that information on the option of perinatal support care programs be given to a woman after diagnosis of a life limiting condition; and imposing penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Floor: HB 1058 PN 1675, FP (Y: 116 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1058 PN 1609, 2019 A955, FRANKEL (Y: 88 N: 103 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1058 PN 1609, 2019 A953, RAPP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A00799 (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-29 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A00848 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Health: To Table (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2019-05-06SenateIn the Senate
2019-05-06HouseThird consideration and final passage (116-77)
2019-05-06HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-05-01HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-05-01HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-04-30HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-29HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-29HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-29HouseReported as amended
2019-04-05HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1058
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1058&pn=1220
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1058&pn=1609
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1058&pn=1675
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=04/29/2019&RollCallId=358
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=04/29/2019&RollCallId=359
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=04/29/2019&RollCallId=360
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=04/29/2019&RollCallId=361
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=228
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=229
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=254
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/06/2019&RollCallId=447

Bill Comments

feedback