PA HB1069 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-05 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-05 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 65 (Public Officers) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in open meetings, further providing for public notice and providing for notification of agency business required and exceptions.
Title
In open meetings, further providing for public notice and providing for notification of agency business required and exceptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1069 PN 2529, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - House - House Floor: HB 1069 PN 2209, 2019 A2825, WHEELAND (Y: 186 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A02064 (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-13 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1069 PN 2529, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-19 - House - House Floor: HB 1069 PN 2209, 2019 A2825, WHEELAND (Y: 186 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 20 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A02064 (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-05 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-07-13 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-01-24 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2020-01-14 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-01-14 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-0) |
2020-01-14 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-09-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-09-19 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-09-17 | House | Removed from table |
2019-09-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-19 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2019-06-19 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-19 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |