PA HB1076 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Passed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-19 - Act No. 20
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 16-3)
Status: Passed on May 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-19 - Act No. 20
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 27, 2006 (1st Sp.Sess., P.L.1873 No.1), known as the Taxpayer Relief Act, in senior citizens property tax and rent rebate assistance, further providing for filing of claim; and authorizing public school districts to implement a senior tax reduction incentive volunteer exchange program.
Title
In senior citizens property tax and rent rebate assistance, further providing for filing of claim; and authorizing public school districts to implement a senior tax reduction incentive volunteer exchange program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1076 PN 3594, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1076 PN 3594, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1076 PN 3567, 2019 A5150, HENNESSEY (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1076 PN 3567, 2019 A5150, SUSP RULES, HENNESSEY (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1076 PN 2120, 2019 A5009, WHITE (Y: 199 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1076 PN 2120, 2019 A2013, OTTEN (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A01762 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A01830 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A01829 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A01721 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1076 PN 3594, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - Senate - Senate Finance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1076 PN 3594, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1076 PN 3567, 2019 A5150, HENNESSEY (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1076 PN 3567, 2019 A5150, SUSP RULES, HENNESSEY (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1076 PN 2120, 2019 A5009, WHITE (Y: 199 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1076 PN 2120, 2019 A2013, OTTEN (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A01762 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A01830 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A01829 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - House - House Aging And Older Adult Services: Adopt Amendment A01721 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-19 | Senate | Act No. 20 |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2020-05-14 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Signed in House |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-04-29 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-04-29 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2020-04-27 | Senate | Referred to FINANCE |
2020-04-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-04-20 | House | Final passage (202-0) |
2020-04-20 | House | Third consideration, with amendments |
2020-04-20 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-04-14 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-04-14 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2020-04-13 | House | Removed from table |
2019-11-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-21 | House | Removed from table |
2019-09-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-12 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2019-06-12 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-12 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to AGING AND OLDER ADULT SERVICES |