PA HB1077 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-19 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in fees, further providing for annual hauling permits; and, in size, weight and load, further providing for conditions of permits and security for damages and for permit for movement during course of manufacture and providing for permit for movement of hot ingots or hot boxes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In fees, further providing for annual hauling permits; and, in size, weight and load, further providing for conditions of permits and security for damages and for permit for movement during course of manufacture and providing for permit for movement of hot ingots or hot boxes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1077 PN 1628, FP (Y: 196 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00880 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A00875 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-19SenateLaid on the table
2019-06-18SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-18SenateReported as amended
2019-05-24SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2019-05-13SenateIn the Senate
2019-05-13HouseThird consideration and final passage (196-2)
2019-05-13HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-05-08HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-05-08HouseSecond consideration
2019-05-07HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-30HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-30HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-30HouseReported as amended
2019-04-05HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1077
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1077&pn=1237
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1077&pn=1628
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1077&pn=2180
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=04/29/2019&RollCallId=381
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=04/29/2019&RollCallId=382
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=04/29/2019&RollCallId=383
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=304
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/13/2019&RollCallId=502
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=06/18/2019&RollCallId=344

Bill Comments

feedback