PA HB1079 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act repealing the act of July 11, 1901 (P.L.668, No.337), entitled "An act to amend an act, entitled "An act to provide revenue by taxation," approved the fifteenth day of July, Anno Domini one thousand eight hundred and ninety-seven."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repealing the act of July 11, 1901 (P.L.668, No.337), entitled "An act to amend an act, entitled "An act to provide revenue by taxation," approved the fifteenth day of July, Anno Domini one thousand eight hundred and ninety-seven."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1079 PN 1253, FP (Y: 189 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateReferred to FINANCE
2019-05-01SenateIn the Senate
2019-05-01HouseThird consideration and final passage (189-1)
2019-05-01HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-04-30HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-04-30HouseSecond consideration
2019-04-29HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-17HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-17HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-17HouseReported as committed
2019-04-08HouseReferred to FINANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback