PA HB109 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-09-12 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in fraud and abuse control, further providing for definitions and for provider prohibited acts, criminal penalties and civil remedies.
Title
In fraud and abuse control, further providing for definitions and for provider prohibited acts, criminal penalties and civil remedies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-21 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-09-12 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-21 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2022-06-21 | House | First consideration |
2022-06-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-01-11 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |