PA HB1105 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 40-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: Senate Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of May 19, 1995 (P.L.4, No.2), known as the Land Recycling and Environmental Remediation Standards Act, in miscellaneous provisions, further providing for permits and other requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In miscellaneous provisions, further providing for permits and other requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1105 PN 2239, FP (Y: 105 N: 96 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1105 PN 1598, 2019 A2270, NELSON (Y: 129 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-08SenateReferred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
2019-06-25SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-25HouseThird consideration and final passage (105-96)
2019-06-25HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-24HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-24HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-06-24HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-18HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-18HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-18HouseReported as committed
2019-04-29HouseReferred to COMMERCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1105
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1105&pn=1598
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1105&pn=2239
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=6&theDate=06/18/2019&RollCallId=799
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=540
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/24/2019&RollCallId=893
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/25/2019&RollCallId=930
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=566

Bill Comments

feedback