PA HB1166 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act No. 26
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act No. 26
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 11, 1889 (P.L.188, No.210), entitled "A further supplement to an act, entitled 'An act to establish a board of wardens for the Port of Philadelphia, and for the regulation of pilots and pilotage, and for other purposes,' approved March twenty-ninth, one thousand eight hundred and three, and for regulating the rates of pilotage and number of pilots," further providing for rates of pilotage and computation, for pilotage fees and unit charge and for charges for services.
Title
Amending the act of May 11, 1889 (P.L.188, No.210), entitled "A further supplement to an act, entitled 'An act to establish a board of wardens for the Port of Philadelphia, and for the regulation of pilots and pilotage, and for other purposes,' approved March twenty-ninth, one thousand eight hundred and three, and for regulating the rates of pilotage and number of pilots," further providing for rates of pilotage and computation, for pilotage fees and unit charge and for charges for services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1166 PN 1344, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Floor: HB 1166 PN 1344, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Floor: HB 1166 PN 1344, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Senate | Act No. 26 |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Signed in House |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-05 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2019-05-08 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-05-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2019-05-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-05-07 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-05-07 | House | Second consideration |
2019-05-06 | House | Removed from table |
2019-04-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-04-16 | House | First consideration |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |