PA HB1168 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 9 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-19 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 4, 1971 (P.L.6, No.2), known as the Tax Reform Code of 1971, in sales and use tax, further providing for the definition of "building machinery and equipment."
Title
In sales and use tax, further providing for the definition of "building machinery and equipment."
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Caltagirone [D] | Rep. Robert Freeman [D] | Rep. Carol Hill-Evans [D] | Rep. David Millard [R] |
Rep. Mark Gillen [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-19 | House | Removed from table |
2020-10-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-07-13 | House | Removed from table |
2020-07-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-14 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-04-06 | House | Removed from table |
2019-11-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-21 | House | Removed from table |
2019-09-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-18 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2019-06-18 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-18 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to FINANCE |