PA HB1171 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-28 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: Senate Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 15 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-28 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: Senate Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in snowmobiles and all-terrain vehicles, further providing for definitions, for restricted account and for registration of snowmobile or ATV; providing for vintage snowmobile permits; and making an editorial change.
Title
In snowmobiles and all-terrain vehicles, further providing for definitions, for restricted account and for registration of snowmobile or ATV; providing for vintage snowmobile permits; and making an editorial change.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-15 - House - HB 1171 PN 3628, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 192 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-14 - House - HB 1171 PN 3628, 2010 A7334, SUSP RULES, ELLIS (Y: 102 N: 89 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-14 - House - HB 1171 PN 3628, 2010 A7334, SUSP RULES, ELLIS (Y: 102 N: 89 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-28 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY | |
2010-06-15 | In the Senate | |
2010-06-15 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-06-14 | Second consideration | |
2010-06-14 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-04-27 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-04-27 | Removed from table | |
2010-04-26 | Laid on the table | |
2010-04-26 | First consideration | |
2010-04-26 | Reported as amended | |
2009-04-23 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |