PA HB1171 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-16)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-12 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-12 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating an overpass on State Route 49 over State Route 15, Lawrence Township, Tioga County, as the Lance Corporal Michael G. Plank Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating an overpass on State Route 49 over State Route 15, Lawrence Township, Tioga County, as the Lance Corporal Michael G. Plank Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - House Floor: HB 1171 PN 1519, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - House Floor: HB 1171 PN 1519, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-12 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2016-04-04 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-04-04 | House | Third consideration and final passage (189-0) |
2016-04-04 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-03-23 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-03-23 | House | Second consideration |
2016-03-22 | House | Removed from table |
2016-03-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-03-14 | House | First consideration |
2016-03-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-05-11 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |