PA HB1171 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on November 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-26 - Act No. 89
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on November 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-26 - Act No. 89
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in particular rights and immunities, providing for contracts or agreements for nondisclosure of certain conduct.
Title
In particular rights and immunities, providing for contracts or agreements for nondisclosure of certain conduct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1171 PN 2892, CONCUR (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1171 PN 2892, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1171 PN 2892, A3972, FARNESE AMENDMENT NO. A-3972 (Y: 20 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1171 PN 1456, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1171 PN 1349, 2019 A768, BURNS (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1171 PN 2892, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1171 PN 2892, A3972, FARNESE AMENDMENT NO. A-3972 (Y: 20 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1171 PN 1456, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1171 PN 1349, 2019 A768, BURNS (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-26 | House | Act No. 89 |
2019-11-26 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2019-11-22 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2019-11-21 | House | Signed in Senate |
2019-11-21 | House | Signed in House |
2019-11-21 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (187-0) |
2019-11-21 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2019-11-21 | House | Referred to RULES |
2019-11-20 | House | In the House |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-11-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2019-04-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-04-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-0) |
2019-04-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-04-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-04-16 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-04-15 | House | Removed from table |
2019-04-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-04-15 | House | First consideration |
2019-04-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-04-09 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |