PA HB1174 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-1)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-11 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-11 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 27, 2006 (1st Sp.Sess., P.L.1873, No.1), known as the Taxpayer Relief Act, in senior citizens property tax and rent rebate assistance, further providing for definitions; and prohibiting certain use of rent rebates.
Title
In senior citizens property tax and rent rebate assistance, further providing for definitions; and prohibiting certain use of rent rebates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-12-11 | House | Removed from table |
2013-10-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-10-15 | House | First consideration |
2013-10-15 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-04-10 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |