PA HB1174 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-10 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act repealing the act of April 25, 1933 (P.L.74, No.49), entitled "An act relating to baseball and football on Sunday; prohibiting baseball and football on Sunday during certain hours, and also during certain other hours unless the electors of a municipality are in favor of the same and, in certain cases, a license has first been secured from the municipal authorities; providing for referendums to ascertain the will of the electors, and for the enactment and repeal of licensing ordinances and resolutions in accordance therewith; providing penalties; and repealing inconsistent laws."
Title
Repealing the act of April 25, 1933 (P.L.74, No.49), entitled "An act relating to baseball and football on Sunday; prohibiting baseball and football on Sunday during certain hours, and also during certain other hours unless the electors of a municipality are in favor of the same and, in certain cases, a license has first been secured from the municipal authorities; providing for referendums to ascertain the will of the electors, and for the enactment and repeal of licensing ordinances and resolutions in accordance therewith; providing penalties; and repealing inconsistent laws."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-22 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1174 PN 1360, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1174 PN 1360, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-10 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2020-04-21 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-04-21 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Removed from table |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2019-10-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-05-01 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-05-01 | House | Third consideration and final passage (190-0) |
2019-05-01 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-04-30 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-04-30 | House | Second consideration |
2019-04-29 | House | Removed from table |
2019-04-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-04-16 | House | First consideration |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |