PA HB1179 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act repealing the act of June 2, 1933 (P.L.1423, No.308), entitled "An act relating to Sunday music; permitting musicians to receive compensation for services rendered on Sunday; authorizing pay concerts to be given and broadcast on Sunday under certain circumstances, and allowing school and certain public buildings and parks to be used therefor; conferring powers and imposing duties on the Department of Public Instruction; and imposing penalties."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repealing the act of June 2, 1933 (P.L.1423, No.308), entitled "An act relating to Sunday music; permitting musicians to receive compensation for services rendered on Sunday; authorizing pay concerts to be given and broadcast on Sunday under certain circumstances, and allowing school and certain public buildings and parks to be used therefor; conferring powers and imposing duties on the Department of Public Instruction; and imposing penalties."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1179 PN 1365, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateReferred to EDUCATION
2019-05-01SenateIn the Senate
2019-05-01HouseThird consideration and final passage (190-0)
2019-05-01HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-04-30HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-04-30HouseSecond consideration
2019-04-29HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-16HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-16HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-16HouseReported as committed
2019-04-10HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback