PA HB1180 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-28 - Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act repealing the act of July 2, 1935 (P.L.599, No.211), entitled "An act relating to motion picture exhibitions and sound motion picture exhibitions, together with orchestral or other instrumental musical or mechanical musical accompaniment, prelude, playing, or selection in connection with or incidental thereto on Sunday; prohibiting motion picture exhibitions and sound motion picture exhibitions, and orchestral or other instrumental musical or mechanical musical accompaniment, prelude, playing, or selection incidental thereto on Sunday during certain hours, and also during other hours, unless the electors of a municipality approve thereof; regulating the employment of persons in conducting such exhibitions on Sunday; providing for referendums to ascertain the will of the electors; and providing penalties; and repealing inconsistent laws."
Title
Repealing the act of July 2, 1935 (P.L.599, No.211), entitled "An act relating to motion picture exhibitions and sound motion picture exhibitions, together with orchestral or other instrumental musical or mechanical musical accompaniment, prelude, playing, or selection in connection with or incidental thereto on Sunday; prohibiting motion picture exhibitions and sound motion picture exhibitions, and orchestral or other instrumental musical or mechanical musical accompaniment, prelude, playing, or selection incidental thereto on Sunday during certain hours, and also during other hours, unless the electors of a municipality approve thereof; regulating the employment of persons in conducting such exhibitions on Sunday; providing for referendums to ascertain the will of the electors; and providing penalties; and repealing inconsistent laws."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-22 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1180 PN 1366, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1180 PN 1366, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | Senate | Laid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9) |
2019-10-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-05-01 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-05-01 | House | Third consideration and final passage (190-0) |
2019-05-01 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-04-30 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-04-30 | House | Second consideration |
2019-04-29 | House | Removed from table |
2019-04-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-04-16 | House | First consideration |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-04-10 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |