PA HB1189 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 24-8)
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-20 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-20 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 35 (Health and Safety) and 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for COVID-19 enforcement officer disability benefits, for COVID-19 health care professionals reporting and for volunteer emergency responders employer tax credit; and, in general provisions, providing for extensions for COVID-19 disaster emergency.
Title
Providing for COVID-19 enforcement officer disability benefits, for COVID-19 health care professionals reporting and for volunteer emergency responders employer tax credit; and, in general provisions, providing for extensions for COVID-19 disaster emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-04-14 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A05043 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A05045 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A05069 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1189 PN 3565, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1189 PN 3565, 2019 A5076, SUSP RULES, BRADFORD (Y: 93 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-10-21 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A03239 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A05045 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A05069 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1189 PN 3565, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-04-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1189 PN 3565, 2019 A5076, SUSP RULES, BRADFORD (Y: 93 N: 109 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-10-21 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A03239 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-20 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2020-04-14 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-04-14 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-04-14 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2020-04-14 | House | Amended in House Committee on APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-03-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-03-25 | House | Second consideration |
2020-03-24 | House | Removed from table |
2020-01-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-01-07 | House | Removed from table |
2019-10-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-21 | House | First consideration |
2019-10-21 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to FINANCE |