PA HB1196 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-24 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-24 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, making editorial changes.
Title
Making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1196 PN 1498, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00786 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00785 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00786 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A00785 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2019-05-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-05-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (190-0) |
2019-05-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-05-01 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-05-01 | House | Second consideration |
2019-04-30 | House | Removed from table |
2019-04-23 | House | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 1498 |
2019-04-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-04-17 | House | First consideration |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-04-15 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |