PA HB12 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Act No. 2 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Act No. 2 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 46475, carrying State Route 1021 over the Susquehanna River in Wyoming Borough, Luzerne County, as the George J. Dennis, Jr., Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 46475, carrying State Route 1021 over the Susquehanna River in Wyoming Borough, Luzerne County, as the George J. Dennis, Jr., Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 12 PN 8, Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Floor: HB 12 PN 8, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-03 - House - House Floor: HB 12 PN 8, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-13 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | Senate | Act No. 2 of 2021 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (46-0) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-02-22 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-02-03 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-02-03 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2021-02-03 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-01-27 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-01-27 | House | Second consideration |
2021-01-26 | House | Removed from table |
2021-01-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-01-25 | House | First consideration |
2021-01-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-01-11 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |