PA HB1203 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Act No. 99
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Act No. 99
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 53 (Municipalities Generally) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in municipal authorities, further providing for money of authority.
Title
In municipal authorities, further providing for money of authority.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1203 PN 2937, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1203 PN 2937, CONCUR (Y: 185 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1203 PN 1738, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00876 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1203 PN 2937, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1203 PN 2937, CONCUR (Y: 185 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1203 PN 1738, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A00876 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-27 | House | Act No. 99 |
2019-11-27 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2019-11-22 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2019-11-21 | House | Signed in Senate |
2019-11-21 | House | Signed in House |
2019-11-21 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (185-0) |
2019-11-21 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2019-11-21 | House | Referred to RULES |
2019-11-21 | House | In the House |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-10-29 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-07-08 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-27 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-27 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2019-06-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-26 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-26 | House | Second consideration |
2019-06-25 | House | Removed from table |
2019-06-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-18 | House | Removed from table |
2019-05-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-06 | House | First consideration |
2019-05-06 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-04-15 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |