PA HB1214 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-25 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of July 19, 1979 (P.L.130, No.48), known as the Health Care Facilities Act, providing for pain management clinics; and imposing penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for pain management clinics; and imposing penalties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Health: Adopt Amendment A01362 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-25HouseLaid on the table
2019-06-25HouseRemoved from table
2019-05-14HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-14HouseFirst consideration
2019-05-14HouseReported as amended
2019-04-15HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback