PA HB122 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-7)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-30 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-30 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 68 (Real and Personal Property) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in home inspections, further providing for home inspection reports.
Title
In home inspections, further providing for home inspection reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-07-07 | House | Removed from table |
2020-07-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-12 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-03-24 | House | Removed from table |
2020-03-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-12-10 | House | Removed from table |
2019-12-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-19 | House | Removed from table |
2019-06-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-06-25 | House | Removed from table |
2019-05-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-14 | House | First consideration |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |