PA HB122 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-18 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-18 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in registration of vehicles, further providing for vehicles exempt from registration; and, in licensing of drivers, further providing for persons exempt from licensing.
Title
In registration of vehicles, further providing for vehicles exempt from registration; and, in licensing of drivers, further providing for persons exempt from licensing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - House - House Floor: HB 122 PN 90, FP (Y: 115 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - House - House Floor: HB 122 PN 90, FP (Y: 115 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-18 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2021-11-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-11-15 | House | Third consideration and final passage (115-84) |
2021-11-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-11-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-11-10 | House | Second consideration |
2021-11-09 | House | Removed from table |
2021-06-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-06-25 | House | Removed from table |
2021-05-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-05 | House | First consideration |
2021-05-05 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |