PA HB1222 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-23 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-23 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 10 (Charities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, consolidating the Solicitation of Funds for Charitable Purposes Act and the Institutions of Purely Public Charity Act; and making related repeals.
Title
Consolidating the Solicitation of Funds for Charitable Purposes Act and the Institutions of Purely Public Charity Act; and making related repeals.
Sponsors
Rep. Andrew Lewis [R] | Rep. David Millard [R] | Rep. Aaron Bernstine [R] | Rep. Dan Moul [R] |
Rep. Joseph Ciresi [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-24 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Floor: HB 1222 PN 1570, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Floor: HB 1222 PN 1570, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-23 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-09-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-09-24 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-19 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-19 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2019-06-19 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-18 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-18 | House | Second consideration |
2019-06-17 | House | Removed from table |
2019-05-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-15 | House | First consideration |
2019-05-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to FINANCE |