PA HB1223 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-5)
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-26 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-26 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for the creation of keystone opportunity dairy zones to facilitate the economic development of Pennsylvania's dairy industry; authorizing expenditures; providing tax exemptions, tax deductions, tax abatements and tax credits; creating additional obligations of the Commonwealth and local governmental units; and prescribing powers and duties of certain State and local departments, agencies and officials.
Title
Providing for the creation of keystone opportunity dairy zones to facilitate the economic development of Pennsylvania's dairy industry; authorizing expenditures; providing tax exemptions, tax deductions, tax abatements and tax credits; creating additional obligations of the Commonwealth and local governmental units; and prescribing powers and duties of certain State and local departments, agencies and officials.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1223 PN 2779, FP (Y: 194 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A03322 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1223 PN 2779, FP (Y: 194 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A03322 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-26 | Senate | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |
2019-12-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-12-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-2) |
2019-12-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-12-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-12-16 | House | Second consideration |
2019-12-10 | House | Removed from table |
2019-10-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-23 | House | First consideration |
2019-10-23 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-04-17 | House | Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS |