PA HB1237 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-15)
Status: Passed on June 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-13 - Act No. 64
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-15)
Status: Passed on June 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-13 - Act No. 64
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in hunting and furtaking licenses, further providing for resident license and fee exemptions.
Title
In hunting and furtaking licenses, further providing for resident license and fee exemptions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-04 - Senate - HB 1237 PN 1356, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-03 - House - HB 1237 PN 1356, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-10-03 - House - HB 1237 PN 1356, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-13 | Senate | Act No. 64 |
2012-06-13 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2012-06-07 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2012-06-05 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2012-06-05 | Senate | Signed in House |
2012-06-04 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-0) |
2012-05-23 | Senate | Second consideration |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2012-05-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-05-21 | Senate | Removed from table |
2012-05-02 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2012-03-28 | Senate | First consideration |
2012-03-28 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2011-10-11 | Senate | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |
2011-10-03 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-10-03 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2011-10-03 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-09-28 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-09-28 | House | Second consideration |
2011-09-27 | House | Removed from table |
2011-06-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-06-26 | House | Removed from table |
2011-05-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-05-25 | House | First consideration |
2011-05-25 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-03-31 | House | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |