PA HB1237 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 54683, on that portion of State Route 3009 (Kushequa Avenue) over the Kinzua Creek in Kushequa, Hamlin Township, McKean County, as the Vietnam Veterans Memorial Bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a bridge, identified as Bridge Key 54683, on that portion of State Route 3009 (Kushequa Avenue) over the Kinzua Creek in Kushequa, Hamlin Township, McKean County, as the Vietnam Veterans Memorial Bridge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1237 PN 1471, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2019-05-13SenateIn the Senate
2019-05-13HouseThird consideration and final passage (199-0)
2019-05-13HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-05-08HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-05-08HouseSecond consideration
2019-05-07HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-30HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-30HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-30HouseReported as committed
2019-04-17HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback