PA HB1240 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-30 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-30 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in certificate of title and security interests, further providing for content and effect of certificate of title and for theft vehicles; and making an editorial change.
Title
In certificate of title and security interests, further providing for content and effect of certificate of title and for theft vehicles; and making an editorial change.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1240 PN 3329, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1240 PN 3124, 2017 A6382, MARSHALL (Y: 186 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A05863 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1240 PN 3329, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1240 PN 3124, 2017 A6382, MARSHALL (Y: 186 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Transportation: Adopt Amendment A05863 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2018-04-16 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-04-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2018-04-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-04-11 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-04-11 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2018-04-10 | House | Removed from table |
2018-03-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-03-12 | House | First consideration |
2018-03-12 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-04-18 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |