PA HB1273 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on April 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-23 - Third consideration and defeated on final passage (71-120)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-23 - Third consideration and defeated on final passage (71-120)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in permits relating to wildlife, further providing for definitions.
Title
In permits relating to wildlife, further providing for definitions.
Sponsors
Rep. David Zimmerman [R] | Rep. William Keller [D] | Rep. Jason Ortitay [R] | Rep. Robert Kauffman [R] |
Rep. Seth Grove [R] | Rep. John Lawrence [R] | Rep. Jesse Topper [R] | Rep. Paul Schemel [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1273 PN 1540, FP (Y: 71 N: 120 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1273 PN 1540, FP (Y: 71 N: 120 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | House | Third consideration and defeated on final passage (71-120) |
2018-05-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-05-22 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-05-22 | House | Second consideration |
2018-05-02 | House | Removed from table |
2018-05-01 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-05-01 | House | First consideration |
2018-05-01 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-04-24 | House | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |