PA HB1276 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-21 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-11-21 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for a fostering independence waiver program for youth who are or have been in substitute care.
Title
Providing for a fostering independence waiver program for youth who are or have been in substitute care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A01706 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A01706 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-11-21 | House | Removed from table |
2019-09-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-10 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2019-06-10 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-10 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-04-17 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |