PA HB128 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-11-10 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, in Independent Fiscal Office, further providing for definitions and for duties of office.
Title
In Independent Fiscal Office, further providing for definitions and for duties of office.
Sponsors
Rep. Barbara Gleim [R] | Rep. Francis Ryan [R] | Rep. Seth Grove [R] | Rep. David Rowe [R] |
Rep. Napoleon Nelson [D] | Rep. Valerie Gaydos [R] | Rep. Dan Moul [R] | Rep. Dawn Keefer [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - House - House Finance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Finance: To Table (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-09 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A01479 (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Finance: To Table (Y: 10 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-06-09 - House - House Finance: Adopt Amendment A01479 (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-11-10 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-09 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2021-06-09 | House | First consideration |
2021-06-09 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-01-12 | House | Referred to FINANCE |