PA HB1283 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in judgments and other liens, further providing for exemption of particular property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In judgments and other liens, further providing for exemption of particular property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1283 PN 1804, 2019 A1393, MOUL (Y: 102 N: 88 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1283 PN 1804, 2019 A1376, HARKINS (Y: 88 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2019-05-13 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A01252 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-28HouseRemoved from table
2019-06-28HouseLaid on the table
2019-06-03HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-05-15HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-05-15HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-05-14HouseRemoved from table
2019-05-13HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-13HouseFirst consideration
2019-05-13HouseReported as amended
2019-04-25HouseReferred to INSURANCE

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1283
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1283&pn=1551
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1283&pn=1804
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1283&pn=1854
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=22&theDate=05/13/2019&RollCallId=496
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=22&theDate=05/13/2019&RollCallId=495
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=323
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=324
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/03/2019&RollCallId=583

Bill Comments

feedback