PA HB1290 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-06 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-06 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in child protective services, further providing for definitions, for reporting procedure, for disposition of complaints received, for responsibility for investigation, for access to information in Statewide database, for information in Statewide database and for release of information in confidential reports.
Title
In child protective services, further providing for definitions, for reporting procedure, for disposition of complaints received, for responsibility for investigation, for access to information in Statewide database, for information in Statewide database and for release of information in confidential reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1290 PN 2818, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Children And Youth: Adopt Amendment A03620 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1290 PN 2818, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Children And Youth: Adopt Amendment A03620 (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-06 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2019-12-16 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-12-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2019-12-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-11-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-11-21 | House | Second consideration |
2019-11-20 | House | Removed from table |
2019-10-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-30 | House | First consideration |
2019-10-30 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-04-25 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |