PA HB1298 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating the bridge, identified as Bridge Key 18676, on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 747 over the Juniata River in Mount Union Borough, Huntingdon County, as the Captain Joseph S. Giacobello Memorial Bridge.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating the bridge, identified as Bridge Key 18676, on that portion of Pennsylvania Route 747 over the Juniata River in Mount Union Borough, Huntingdon County, as the Captain Joseph S. Giacobello Memorial Bridge.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1298 PN 1518, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2019-06-11SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-11HouseThird consideration and final passage (199-0)
2019-06-11HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-10HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-10HouseSecond consideration
2019-06-05HouseRemoved from table
2019-05-07HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-07HouseFirst consideration
2019-05-07HouseReported as committed
2019-04-25HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback