PA HB1311 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Engrossed on July 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: Senate Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 8 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-07-13 - Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY
Pending: Senate Environmental Resources & Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 28, 1995 (P.L.89, No.18), known as the Conservation and Natural Resources Act, in Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, further providing for fees and charges.
Title
In Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, further providing for fees and charges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-08 - House - House Floor: HB 1311 PN 1531, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-08 - House - House Floor: HB 1311 PN 1531, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-07-07 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-13 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2020-07-08 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-07-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2020-07-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-07-07 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-07-07 | House | Second consideration |
2020-07-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-06-22 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2020-06-22 | House | First consideration |
2020-06-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-04-25 | House | Referred to TOURISM AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |