PA HB1315 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 23-6)
Status: Engrossed on October 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-31 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 30 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-31 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in preliminary provisions, further providing for Keystone Exams and graduation requirements.
Title
In preliminary provisions, further providing for Keystone Exams and graduation requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-10-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1315 PN 2744, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A03127 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1315 PN 2744, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Education: Adopt Amendment A03127 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-21 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-31 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2019-10-30 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-10-30 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2019-10-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-10-29 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-10-29 | House | Second consideration |
2019-10-23 | House | Removed from table |
2019-10-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-10-21 | House | First consideration |
2019-10-21 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-04-25 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |