PA HB1316 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-1)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-30 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-30 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, in taxation and finance, providing for spending limitations on the Commonwealth.
Title
A Joint Resolution proposing an amendment to the Constitution of the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania, in taxation and finance, providing for spending limitations on the Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-30 | House | Removed from table |
2020-09-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-07-07 | House | Removed from table |
2020-07-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-12 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-03-24 | House | Removed from table |
2020-03-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-12-10 | House | Removed from table |
2019-12-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-09-19 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-09-19 | House | Second consideration |
2019-09-18 | House | Removed from table |
2019-09-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-19 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2019-06-19 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-04-25 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |