PA HB1323 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 44-27)
Status: Introduced on June 5 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-10-07 - Removed from table
Status: Introduced on June 5 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-10-07 - Removed from table
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, further providing, in Local Government Capital Project Loan Fund provisions, for assistance to municipalities.
Title
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.343, No.176), known as The Fiscal Code, further providing, in Local Government Capital Project Loan Fund provisions, for assistance to municipalities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-10-07 | Removed from table | |
2008-10-07 | Laid on the table | |
2008-06-28 | Removed from table | |
2008-06-28 | Laid on the table | |
2008-05-15 | Removed from table | |
2008-05-15 | Laid on the table | |
2008-03-11 | Removed from table | |
2008-03-11 | Laid on the table | |
2008-01-14 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-11-21 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-11-21 | Removed from table | |
2007-11-20 | Laid on the table | |
2007-11-20 | First consideration | |
2007-11-20 | Reported as committed | |
2007-10-24 | Re-referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2007-10-24 | Reported with request to re-refer to LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2007-06-05 | Referred to FINANCE |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1323 |