PA HB1324 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Act No. 32
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in military educational programs, further providing for definitions, for eligibility, for grants, for amount of grants, for limitations, for recoupment of grant payments, for regulations, for administration and for Educational Assistance Program Fund and providing for a military family education program; and making editorial changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In military educational programs, further providing for definitions, for eligibility, for grants, for amount of grants, for limitations, for recoupment of grant payments, for regulations, for administration and for Educational Assistance Program Fund and providing for a military family education program; and making editorial changes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1324 PN 2179, CONCUR (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1324 PN 2179, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1324 PN 1783, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - House Floor: HB 1324 PN 1629, 2019 A1231, BARRAR (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Adopt Amendment A00847 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Amended A00847 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-01HouseAct No. 32
2019-07-01HouseApproved by the Governor
2019-06-28HousePresented to the Governor
2019-06-28HouseSigned in Senate
2019-06-28HouseSigned in House
2019-06-28HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (199-0)
2019-06-27HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2019-06-27HouseReferred to RULES
2019-06-27HouseIn the House
2019-06-27SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2019-06-25SenateRe-reported as committed
2019-06-19SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-19SenateSecond consideration
2019-06-18SenateFirst consideration
2019-06-18SenateReported as amended
2019-05-24SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2019-05-13SenateIn the Senate
2019-05-13HouseThird consideration and final passage (199-0)
2019-05-13HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-05-08HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-05-08HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-05-07HouseRemoved from table
2019-04-30HouseLaid on the table
2019-04-30HouseFirst consideration
2019-04-30HouseReported as amended
2019-04-25HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1324
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1324&pn=1541
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1324&pn=1629
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1324&pn=1783
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1324&pn=2179
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=04/30/2019&RollCallId=379
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=04/30/2019&RollCallId=378
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=285
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=306
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/13/2019&RollCallId=504
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=21&theDate=06/18/2019&RollCallId=337
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/25/2019&RollCallId=444
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=243
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/27/2019&RollCallId=997
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=631

Bill Comments

feedback