PA HB1335 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-24 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-24 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act repealing in part the act of June 13, 1836 (P.L.551, No.169), entitled "An act relating to roads, highways and bridges."
Title
Repealing in part the act of June 13, 1836 (P.L.551, No.169), entitled "An act relating to roads, highways and bridges."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1335 PN 1571, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1335 PN 1571, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2019-05-14 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-05-14 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2019-05-14 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-05-13 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-05-13 | House | Second consideration |
2019-05-08 | House | Removed from table |
2019-05-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-07 | House | First consideration |
2019-05-07 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-04-26 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |