PA HB1348 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 59-4)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-13 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for limited civil liability for agritourism activity providers, for notice of limited civil liability and for acknowledgment of limited civil liability.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for limited civil liability for agritourism activity providers, for notice of limited civil liability and for acknowledgment of limited civil liability.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-12-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1348 PN 2013, 2019 A4264, ECKER (Y: 178 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A01614 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-13HouseRemoved from table
2020-07-13HouseLaid on the table
2020-05-14HouseRemoved from table
2020-05-14HouseLaid on the table
2020-04-06HouseRemoved from table
2020-04-06HouseLaid on the table
2019-12-18HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-12-17HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-12-17HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-12-16HouseRemoved from table
2019-11-21HouseLaid on the table
2019-11-21HouseRemoved from table
2019-09-17HouseLaid on the table
2019-09-17HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-05HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-05HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-05HouseReported as amended
2019-05-01HouseReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1348
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1348&pn=1642
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1348&pn=2013
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1348&pn=3056
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=2&theDate=06/05/2019&RollCallId=616
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=2&theDate=06/05/2019&RollCallId=617
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=987
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/18/2019&RollCallId=1563

Bill Comments

feedback