PA HB1351 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act No. 3A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act No. 3A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A Supplement to the act of July 28, 1966 (3rd Sp.Sess., P.L.87, No.3), known as the University of Pittsburgh--Commonwealth Act, making appropriations for carrying the same into effect; and providing for a basis for payments of such appropriations, for a method of accounting for the funds appropriated and for certain fiscal information disclosure.
Title
A Supplement to the act of July 28, 1966 (3rd Sp.Sess., P.L.87, No.3), known as the University of Pittsburgh--Commonwealth Act, making appropriations for carrying the same into effect; and providing for a basis for payments of such appropriations, for a method of accounting for the funds appropriated and for certain fiscal information disclosure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1351 PN 2234, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 44 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1351 PN 2234, FP (Y: 169 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A02489 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1351 PN 2234, FP (Y: 169 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A02489 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Senate | Act No. 3A |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Signed in House |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (44-6) |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (169-32) |
2019-06-24 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2019-05-15 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-05-15 | House | Second consideration |
2019-05-14 | House | Removed from table |
2019-05-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-13 | House | First consideration |
2019-05-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-05-01 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |