PA HB1354 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act No. 6A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-28 - Act No. 6A
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making appropriations to the Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania.
Title
Making appropriations to the Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1354 PN 2237, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1354 PN 2237, FP (Y: 196 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A02075 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1354 PN 2237, FP (Y: 196 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt Amendment A02075 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-24 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-28 | Senate | Act No. 6A |
2019-06-28 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Signed in House |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-06-25 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (196-5) |
2019-06-24 | House | Re-reported as amended |
2019-05-15 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-05-15 | House | Second consideration |
2019-05-14 | House | Removed from table |
2019-05-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-13 | House | First consideration |
2019-05-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-05-01 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |