PA HB1363 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-7)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-06 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-10-06 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act establishing a bill of rights for individuals with intellectual disabilities or autism; and providing for waiting lists for intellectual disability or autism services and report.
Title
Establishing a bill of rights for individuals with intellectual disabilities or autism; and providing for waiting lists for intellectual disability or autism services and report.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-06 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1363 PN 3796, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A05745 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1363 PN 3796, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Human Services: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Human Services: Adopt Amendment A05745 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-10-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-10-06 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2020-06-09 | Senate | In the Senate |
2020-06-09 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2020-06-09 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2020-05-28 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-05-28 | House | Second consideration |
2020-05-27 | House | Removed from table |
2020-05-19 | House | Laid on the table |
2020-05-19 | House | First consideration |
2020-05-19 | House | Reported as amended |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to HUMAN SERVICES |