PA HB1370 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making an appropriation from a restricted revenue account within the General Fund to the Office of Consumer Advocate in the Office of Attorney General.
Title
Making an appropriation from a restricted revenue account within the General Fund to the Office of Consumer Advocate in the Office of Attorney General.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-05-15 | House | Second consideration |
2019-05-14 | House | Removed from table |
2019-05-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-13 | House | First consideration |
2019-05-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-05-01 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |