PA HB1374 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-15 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making appropriations from a restricted revenue account within the General Fund and from Federal augmentation funds to the Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission for the fiscal year July 1, 2019, to June 30, 2020.
Title
Making appropriations from a restricted revenue account within the General Fund and from Federal augmentation funds to the Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission for the fiscal year July 1, 2019, to June 30, 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-15 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-05-15 | House | Second consideration |
2019-05-14 | House | Removed from table |
2019-05-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-13 | House | First consideration |
2019-05-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-05-01 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |