PA HB138 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of October 10, 1975 (P.L.383, No.110), known as the Physical Therapy Practice Act, further providing for qualifications for license and examinations for physical therapists and physical therapist assistants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for qualifications for license and examinations for physical therapists and physical therapist assistants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Floor: HB 138 PN 131, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateReferred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
2019-03-20SenateIn the Senate
2019-03-20HouseThird consideration and final passage (193-0)
2019-03-20HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-03-19HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-03-19HouseSecond consideration
2019-03-18HouseRemoved from table
2019-03-13HouseLaid on the table
2019-03-13HouseFirst consideration
2019-03-13HouseReported as committed
2019-01-28HouseReferred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback