PA HB1380 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-7)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-08 - Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
Pending: Senate Game & Fisheries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-08 - Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES
Pending: Senate Game & Fisheries Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 30 (Fish) and 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in fishing licenses, providing for active duty military fishing reciprocity and for disabled veteran annual fishing license reciprocity; and, in hunting and furtaking licenses, providing for active duty military hunting reciprocity and for disabled veteran annual hunting license reciprocity.
Title
In fishing licenses, providing for active duty military fishing reciprocity and for disabled veteran annual fishing license reciprocity; and, in hunting and furtaking licenses, providing for active duty military hunting reciprocity and for disabled veteran annual hunting license reciprocity.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1380 PN 1671, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1380 PN 1671, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Game And Fisheries: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | Senate | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |
2019-06-27 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-06-27 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2019-06-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-26 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-26 | House | Second consideration |
2019-06-25 | House | Removed from table |
2019-05-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-05-14 | House | First consideration |
2019-05-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-05-01 | House | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |