PA HB1402 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Act No. 100
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in sexual offenses, providing for the offense of sexual extortion.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In sexual offenses, providing for the offense of sexual extortion.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-21 - House - House Floor: HB 1402 PN 2817, CONCUR (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-11-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1402 PN 2817, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - House Floor: HB 1402 PN 2006, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - House - House Floor: HB 1402 PN 1835, 2019 A1533, D.MILLER (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A01333 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-27HouseAct No. 100
2019-11-27HouseApproved by the Governor
2019-11-22HousePresented to the Governor
2019-11-21HouseSigned in Senate
2019-11-21HouseSigned in House
2019-11-21HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (187-0)
2019-11-21HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2019-11-21HouseReferred to RULES
2019-11-20HouseIn the House
2019-11-20SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2019-11-18SenateSecond consideration
2019-10-29SenateFirst consideration
2019-10-29SenateReported as amended
2019-06-06SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2019-06-05SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-05HouseThird consideration and final passage (195-0)
2019-06-05HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-04HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-04HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-05-15HouseRemoved from table
2019-05-14HouseLaid on the table
2019-05-14HouseFirst consideration
2019-05-14HouseReported as amended
2019-05-06HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1402
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1402&pn=1722
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1402&pn=1835
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1402&pn=2006
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1402&pn=2817
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=05/14/2019&RollCallId=543
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=05/14/2019&RollCallId=544
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=346
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=367
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/05/2019&RollCallId=643
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=10/29/2019&RollCallId=599
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=347
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=11/21/2019&RollCallId=1441
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=914

Bill Comments

feedback