PA HB1410 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Act No. 101
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-27 - Act No. 101
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 8, 2004 (P.L.1801, No.238), known as the Transit Revitalization Investment District Act, in general provisions, further providing for declaration of policy and for definitions; providing for military installation remediation; and establishing the Military Installation Remediation Fund.
Title
In general provisions, further providing for declaration of policy and for definitions; providing for military installation remediation; and establishing the Military Installation Remediation Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-11-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1410 PN 2161, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1410 PN 2161, FP (Y: 144 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1410 PN 2161, MOT POSTPONE, MCCARTER (Y: 90 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-06-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1410 PN 1728, 2019 A2038, STEPHENS (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1410 PN 1728, 2019 A2038, SUSP RULES, STEPHENS (Y: 195 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Commerce: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-29 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1410 PN 2161, FP (Y: 144 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-09-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1410 PN 2161, MOT POSTPONE, MCCARTER (Y: 90 N: 108 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2019-06-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1410 PN 1728, 2019 A2038, STEPHENS (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1410 PN 1728, 2019 A2038, SUSP RULES, STEPHENS (Y: 195 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 28 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Commerce: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Commerce: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-27 | Senate | Act No. 101 |
2019-11-27 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2019-11-20 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2019-11-19 | Senate | Signed in House |
2019-11-18 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (42-7) |
2019-10-29 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2019-10-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2019-10-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2019-10-22 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2019-09-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-09-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (144-54) |
2019-06-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-17 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-06-17 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2019-06-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-06-11 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2019-06-11 | House | First consideration |
2019-06-11 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to COMMERCE |